Williams v. Horner

Plaintiff: David Williams
Defendant: Scott Horner
Case Number: 5:2009cv00163
Filed: June 5, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 87 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/28/11. (kpr)
September 7, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 58 Partial Report and Recommendations and 52 Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by David Williams. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/7/11. (kpr)
May 2, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 34 Partial Report and Recommendations with the exception that the ADC is not directed to keep pltf's pleadings and exhibits in the ADC library; instead the ADC must allow pltf to keep the pleadings and exhibits in his possessio n and that he have ready access to all pleadings and exhibits in this particular case; pltf's 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; pltf's 30 Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/2/11. (vjt)
February 3, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft Horner and the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the Complaint with any attachments and a summons for deft Horner through the Compliance Office of the ADC, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/3/11. (bkp)
July 13, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 5 and dismissing complaint with prejudice counting the dismissal as a "strike," and certifying that an ifp taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/13/09. (bkp)
June 23, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that the District Court dismiss 2 Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice, with the dismissal counting as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Court also recommends that the Distr ict Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action would be frivolous and would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 7/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/23/09. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?