Harris et al v. Ladd

Plaintiff: Randy Harris and Gloria Harris
Defendant: Robert Ladd
Case Number: 5:2009cv00179
Filed: June 22, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT 48 , pursuant to 45 Jury Verdict, judgment is entered in favor of Randy Harris against Robert Ladd in the amount of $35,621.00; and pursuant to 46 Jury Verdict, judgment is entered in favor of Gloria Harris against Robert Ladd in the amount of $24,895.25, plus costs and post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.11% per annum. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/6/12. (vjt)
February 3, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 45 Jury Verdict, judgment is entered in favor of Randy Harris against Robert Ladd in the amount of $35,621.00; and pursuant to 46 Jury Verdict, judgment is entered in favor of Gloria Harris against Robert Ladd in the amount of $24,895.25, plus costs and prejudgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.11% per annum. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/3/12. (vjt)
January 31, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Mike Huckabay, Sr., to bring electronic devices into the courthouse in Pine Bluff between 2/1/12 and 2/3/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/31/12. (vjt)
January 25, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltfs' 34 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/25/12. (vjt)
October 28, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Jury Trial will begin at 9:15 a.m. on Monday, November 14, 2011 in Pine Bluff; counsel should be present thirty minutes prior to trial. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 110/28/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Harris
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Harris
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?