Cannon v. Norris

Plaintiff: Steve Cannon
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2009cv00209
Filed: July 28, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 64 Order granting defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/27/10. (bkp)
March 16, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Green directing plaintiff to file a response within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/16/10. (bkp)
March 2, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 44 Partial Report and Recommendations, 34 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Reese, King, Landry, Harris, Goodman and dismissing these defendants without prejudice; and directing the Clerk to update plaintiff's address as requested by the plaintiff in docket #52. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/2/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss Nurse Bradley from plaintiff's complaint and to docket plaintiff's response (de#29) as an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
January 12, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that deft Green be served with summons, complaint and amended complaint in care of the Ark. Board of Correction and Community Punishment, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/12/09. (bkp)
November 4, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file an updated request to proceed ifp within fifteen days of the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to forward to plaintiff an IFP application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/4/09. (bkp)
September 14, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts Larry Norris and Arkansas Department of Correction for plaintiff's failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/14/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?