Halfacre v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Kenny Halfacre
Defendant: Larry Norris, Larry May, Ronald Dobbs, Mark Cashion, Grant Harris and Michael E Burns
Case Number: 5:2009cv00216
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 58 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, dismissing this case with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/11/2010. (jct)
March 30, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Witness List (purs. to FRCvP 26(a)(3)(A)(ii)) filed by Kenny Halfacre (32] and directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure plaintiff's attendance at the hearing scheduled for April 12, 2010, and to bring plaintiff's institutional and medical records to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/30/10. (bkp)
September 25, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 20 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenny Halfacre. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/25/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halfacre v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Halfacre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?