Delta Natural Kraft LLC v. Graphic Packaging International Inc

Plaintiff: Delta Natural Kraft LLC
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International Inc
Case Number: 5:2009cv00217
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 deft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/3/10. (bkp)
December 22, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: confidential information. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/22/2009. (thd)
August 26, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Graphic Packaging International Inc, which will be withdrawn upon the filing of an amended complaint by plaintiff, with the responsive pleading of deft GPI to the first amended complaint to be due 20 days from the filing of the first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/26/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Natural Kraft LLC v. Graphic Packaging International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Natural Kraft LLC
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?