Ashford v. Washington et al

Plaintiff: Charles Ashford
Defendant: Bobby Washington, Walter Washington, Ezell, L Cantrell and J Wilson
Case Number: 5:2009cv00272
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 74 Order granting plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the case with prejudice, denying the relief sought. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/5/10. (bkp)
June 17, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 64 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 60 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief is hereby DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/17/10. (vjt)
May 3, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; and granting defendant Ezell's 56 Motion for Leave to File his answer out of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/3/10. (bkp)
March 4, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the defendant Ezell and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons, original and amended complaints on deft at the address provided under seal without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/4/10. (bkp)
October 27, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Default Judgment and ordering the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft Ezell and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and the original and amended complaints on deft at the address provided under seal without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 10/27/09. (bkp)
October 14, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing deft L. Cantrell from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/14/09. (bkp)
September 29, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of original and amended complaints and summons on defts in care of the ADC Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 9/29/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashford v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?