Floyd's Chipmill Inc v. Indiana Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Floyd's Chipmill Inc
Defendant: Indiana Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2009cv00275
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Floyd's bad faith claim is hereby dismissed; ILM's contribution claim against the Glenn Defendants is dismissed; granting in part and denying in part 47 ILM's motion for summary judgment; denying 55 Floyd's motion for summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part 62 motion for summary judgment filed by the Glenn Defendants. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/7/11. (vjt)
October 1, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 51 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference and canceling the settlement conference scheduled for October 14, 2010 before Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney 58 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/10. (bkp)
August 3, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/3/10. (bkp)
July 26, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Compel as stated herein; and directing ILM to provide updated responses to plaintiff's discovery requests on or before August 18, 2010. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/26/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd's Chipmill Inc v. Indiana Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd's Chipmill Inc
Represented By: Robert M. Cearley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Lumbermens Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?