Cox v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: David Cox
Defendant: Larry Norris, Roy Agee and Elizabeth Rice
Case Number: 5:2009cv00300
Filed: September 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 22 Recommended Disposition and denying 19 Motion to Vacate filed by David Cox. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/14/10. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 4/15/2010 to correct the description of the document filed.)(thd).
December 16, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 14 Order entered this day, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/16/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 12/17/2009 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
October 23, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's 2 Complaint be DISMISSED and all pending motions be DENIED as moot. Objections to REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS due 11/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/23/2009. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Agee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?