Welcher v. Davis Nursing Association et al

Plaintiff: Joyce R Welcher
Defendant: Davis Nursing Association, Louise King and Benita Pridgeon
Case Number: 5:2009cv00304
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Pursuant to the order entered this day, judgment is entered for defendant Davis Nursing Association. The motion for summary judgment filed by defendant is granted. Plaintiff Joyce R. Welcher's race discrimination, disability discrimination and retaliation claims are dismissed with prejudice. Her wrongful termination claim is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/25/11. (hph)
December 15, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Dismiss of deft Louise King. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/15/09. (bkp)
December 3, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Louise King by noon on Wednesday, December 9, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/3/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welcher v. Davis Nursing Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce R Welcher
Represented By: Leon Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Nursing Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benita Pridgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?