Ireland v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Linda Ireland
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Larry B Norris and James T Banks
Case Number: 5:2009cv00337
Filed: October 29, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 56 Order entered separately today, the claims of Linda Ireland that arise under the laws and constitution of the United States are dismissed with prejudice. The claims of Linda Ireland that arise under the laws of the State of Arkansas are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/21/2011. (dmn)
September 19, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 38 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal; defts may file under seal the exhibits to their summary judgment motion, the brief in support, and the statement of facts. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/19/11. (vjt)
September 12, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 35 Motion to Extend the Motions Deadline; Motions due by 9/21/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/12/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ireland v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ireland
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry B Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?