William Welch Estate v. Principal Financial Group Inc et al

Plaintiff: William Welch Estate
Defendant: Principal Financial Group Inc and Thelma Nelson
Case Number: 5:2009cv00354
Filed: November 12, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that there is no ERISA claim presently before the Court, therefore, the Court has no jurisdiction; this action is hereby REMANDED to state court; the Clerk is directed to disburse the funds held in the registry to Principal Life plus accrued interest, less the registry fee. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/18/10. (vjt)
August 13, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCINDING 20 ERISA Scheduling Order issued on July 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/13/10. (vjt)
July 21, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file proof of service on Thelma Nelson within seven days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/21/10. (bkp)
July 9, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescinding 5 Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/9/10. (bkp)
June 4, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the funds deposited by Principal Life Insurance Company into the registry of the Court are to be invested in an interest-bearing account. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/4/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Welch Estate v. Principal Financial Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Welch Estate
Represented By: Andre K. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Financial Group Inc
Represented By: Leigh Anne Yeargan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thelma Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?