Jones v. Golden et al

Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Defendant: Darryl Golden and John Does
Case Number: 5:2010cv00068
Filed: March 15, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 129 Motion for Review by the District Judge of Judge Deere's Orders 94 123 127 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/8/11. (vjt)
April 19, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 96 and granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/19/11. (kpr)
November 29, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying pltf of his opportunity to file a response and statement of facts opposing defts' 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/29/10. (vjt)
July 16, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 34 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 11 25 Motions for Preliminary Injunction filed by Larry Wayne Jones. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/16/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Golden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?