Drew County Arkansas v. Joh Pas Murray Company

Plaintiff: Drew County Arkansas
Defendant: Joh Pas Murray Company
Case Number: 5:2010cv00069
Filed: March 15, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the 46 Stipulation for Dismissal, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/21/11. (vjt)
April 22, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Hospital's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Murray Company's 30 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying Cromwell's 16 Motion to Quash Subpoena or for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/22/11. (vjt)
October 5, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 20 MOTION for Andrew S. Buchanan to Appear Pro Hac Vice as additional counsel for Joh Pas Murray Company. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/5/10. (vjt)
June 28, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion for Jeremy P. Brummond and Robert J. Golterman to Appear pro hac vice as additional counsel for Joh Pas Murray Company. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/28/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drew County Arkansas v. Joh Pas Murray Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew County Arkansas
Represented By: Charles C. Gibson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joh Pas Murray Company
Represented By: John Polk Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?