Bell v. Pfizer Inc et al

Plaintiff: Shirley J Bell
Defendant: Pfizer Inc, Wyeth LLC, Schwarz Pharma Inc, Pliva USA Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc and Alaven Pharmaceutical LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv00101
Filed: April 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Drew
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Consistent with the order entered today, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice, and the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/16/12. (hph)
May 19, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 53 Order denying pltf's motion to quash and for a protective order. Pltf Bell and her medical providers are reminded that text-only entries filed via the CM/ECF system are valid orders of the court, and that failure to comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual may give rise to a finding of contempt. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/19/11. (kpr)
April 15, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/15/11. (kpr)
March 16, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing all claims against Pfizer, Wyeth, Schwarz, and Alaven with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/16/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Pfizer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley J Bell
Represented By: Alexandra V. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pliva USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaven Pharmaceutical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?