Dunlap v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Michael D Dunlap
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00136
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 54 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/21/12. (kpr)
May 3, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 50 Addendum filed by Michael D Dunlap. The Court will allow petitioner up to and including May 17, 2012 to file his objecctions to the recommended disposition of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/3/12. (kpr)
April 18, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/18/12. (kpr)
April 11, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Compel. Respondent is directed to notify the Court upon mailing the requested documents. Petitioner will be allowed 15 days from the date on which the documents are mailed to submit his objections to the proposed findings and recommended disposition. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/11/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlap v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?