Guinther v. Banks et al

Plaintiff: Edgar L Guinther
Defendant: J Banks, Doe, Randall L Williams and Larry B Norris
Case Number: 5:2010cv00139
Filed: May 6, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 138 Motion for Reconsideration re 136 Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/10/11. (kpr)
March 30, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defts re 135 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations; and certifying that an ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/30/11. (kpr)
December 15, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 83 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 71 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Edgar L Guinther. The Clerk is directed to provide the Plaintiff with a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/15/10. (bkp)
November 29, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 73 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 57 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; dismissing defts Larry Norris and Randall Williams without prejudice; directing the Clerk to file plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Fi le a Fourth Amended Complaint (docket entry #57) as his Fourth Amended Complaint, and to add Wendy Kelley as a deft, to prepare summons for deft Kelley and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve deft Kelley with the summons, complaint, amended complaint, second amended complaint, and third amended complaint in care of the ADC Compliance Office and without fees therefor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/29/10. (bkp)
November 10, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 68 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 51 Motion for TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/10/10. (vjt)
October 1, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PARTIAL ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 47 denying deft Banks' 36 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/10. (bkp)
July 7, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REJECTING 9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and directing the Clerk to file a copy of the Objections as a Second Amended Complaint and to serve it on all defts. The Clerk will prepare summons for defts Banks, Williams and Norris, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, second amended complaint and this Order on them through the ADC Compliance Division without prepayment of fees therefor; and directing the ADC Compliance Office to provide t he Court with a sealed statement providing deft Banks' last known address, if he is no longer with the ADC; Clerk will prepare summons for deft Rectenwald and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint and second amended complaint and this Order on him through the Humphries & Lewis Law firm, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/7/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guinther v. Banks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar L Guinther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry B Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?