Fritts v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Brandon Fritts
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Grant Harris, John Whaley, Darrell Golden, Sherry Conrad, Bobby Washington and Joe Page
Case Number: 5:2010cv00171
Filed: June 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 66 Report and Recommendations. Defendants' 64 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/22/2012. (pag)
December 9, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 37 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 35 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss his claims against deft Washington, and his Motion for Leave to Begin Discovery are GRANTED; Bobby Washington is hereby DISMISSED from this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/9/10. (vjt)
September 24, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 23 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/24/10. (vjt)
August 23, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaint 2 , and this Order on deft John Whaley (ADDRESS FILED UNDER SEAL), without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/23/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fritts v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Fritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?