Roberts v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Brunson Roberts
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Wendy Kelley, Darryl Golden, Gardner, R Johnson, A Emsweller, F Piggy, R Webb and Tucker
Case Number: 5:2010cv00174
Filed: June 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall Jr.
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2013 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 172 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff must file a completed ifp application, including the prison account statement, by September 25, 2013. The Court will reevaluate the payment schedule in due course if Roberts supplements the record. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/12/13. (kpr) (Modified on 9/12/2013 to correct typographical error). (vjt)
March 20, 2013 162 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Ricky Webb, Roderick Johnson against Brunson Roberts re 157 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/20/13. (kpr)
March 7, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 142 Order. The newly produced records attached to this Order will not be admitted into evidence, nor may they be used for impeachment. This ruling is without prejudice to the defts' revisiting the issue. Roberts will not be allowed to cross-examine witnesses about the lack of additional sanitation logs and rosters. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/7/13. (kpr)
March 5, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The ADC is directed to ensure the attendance of plaintiff Brunson Roberts (ADC #127841), Tucker Unit, at 8:15 a.m. on 3/11/13 and each day thereafter until completion of the trial. The trial is scheduled for Monday, 3/11/13 at the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 1-A, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas. The ADC is further directed to send with plaintiff his complete institutional and medical files. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/5/13. (kpr)
February 22, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 114 128 Motion for Costs. The Court will pay the entire cost of supplemental depositions, and mileage and witness fees. Transcription services will be reimbursed at 75%. There will be no reimb ursement for the $50 paid to the process server for Ms. Robinson's subpoena; granting in part and denying in part 129 Motion to Approve/Approval. The Court will pay the witness and mileage fees for these three witnesses, but the Court w ill not pay $50 per witness for personal service. The total reimbursement comes to $4,810.15. The Court directs the Clerk to make this payment to appointed counsel. Granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion for Summary Judgment. Tucker is dismissed as a deft. The case will proceed solely on the aspect of Roberts's unconstitutional conditions-of-confinement claim on 3/11/13. Granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion in Limine, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/22/13. (kpr)
February 20, 2013 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to provide information, as set forth in this Order, prior to the hearing set for 1:30 p.m., on Thursday, February 21, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/20/13. (kpr)
November 26, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing referral to Magistrate Judge Ray. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/26/12. (kpr)
February 6, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 83 Partial Report and Recommendations with clarifications, as set forth in this Order; denying 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing, without prejudice, defts Piggee and Emsweller. All pltf's requests for injunctive relief are denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/6/12. (kpr)
May 27, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting docket entry # 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/27/2011. (ksm)
February 28, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 30 Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray's Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition and 39 Brunson Roberts's objections; granting in part and denying in part 20 Defendants' motion to dismiss. Roberts can purs ue his individual-capacity claims against Johnson and Webb about the 9/9/09 incident. His individual capacity claims against Johnson, Piggee, Webb, Tucker, and Emsweller about the feces under Roberts's door may also go forward. All the official- capacity damages claims are dismissed with prejudice. The rest of Roberts's claims are dismissed without prejudice; and granting 38 Roberts's motion to amend; directing the Clerk to file Document No. 38-1 as Roberts's Amended Complai nt. Notwithstanding this amendment, Roberts may pursue only claims that survive this Order. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. 28 U.s.C.A. § 1915(a (3) (West 2006). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/28/11. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunson Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Emsweller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Piggy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?