Scott v. Department of Defense et al

Plaintiff: Tammy Scott
Defendant: Department of Defense and John M McHugh
Case Number: 5:2010cv00184
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Joint MOTION to Stay the deadlines re 30 Initial Scheduling Order and Stay the Entry of a Final Scheduling Order pending the resolution of deft's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/7/10. (vjt)
November 5, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 35 Motion to Amend Complaint; pltf is directed to file her amended complaint within 7 days from the entry of this Order; denying at this time deft's 28 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/5/10. (vjt)
July 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Tammy Scott: Plaintiff is directed to file a supplemental statement within 30 days from the date of t his Order which evidences her efforts to find counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/8/10. (bkp)
June 28, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pro se pltf to be familiar and comply with all the FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; the Clerk is directed to serve this Order on pltf by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/28/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?