Smith v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: James Edward Smith
Defendant: Larry May, Darryl Golden and Nancy Straughn
Case Number: 5:2010cv00199
Filed: July 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RECHARACTERIZATION ORDER. Plaintiff has up to and including January 8, 2013 to withdraw the complaint, amend the complaint or protest the recharacterization. The Court will consider the motion under § 2254 in its previous form, if Smith does not withdraw or amend the complaint, or protest the change. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/28/12. (kpr)
May 14, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration re 46 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/14/12. (kpr)
July 11, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/11/11. (kpr)
September 29, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Strike 18 Interrogatories Propounded by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/29/10. (bkp)
August 17, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration of 8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/17/10. (bkp)
August 2, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing request to change the designation of this case from the Pine Bluff Division to the Western Division 8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/2/10. (bkp)
July 26, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the designation of this case from 555 to 530; to designate Ray Hobbs as the Respondent; and to terminate defts Larry May, Darryl Golden and Nancy Straughn. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/26/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?