Johnson v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Narvell Johnson
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00226
Filed: July 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration re 18 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations 19 Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/18/11. (bkp)
January 6, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 18 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the petition for writ of habeas corpus with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/6/11. (bkp)
December 17, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Narvell Johnson be denied as untimely, dismissing this action in its entirety with prejudice; a certificate of appealability be denied; Objections to R&R due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 12/17/10. (vjt)
November 10, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying Petitioner of his opportunity to file, on or before 12/10/10, a reply to 10 Response to Habeas Petition filed by Ray Hobbs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 11/10/10. (vjt)
September 30, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the habeas petition and this Order on Respondent and the Arkansas Attorney General by regular mail; Respondent is directed to file a response to the petition within 21 days after service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 9/30/10. (vjt)
August 9, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Petitioner to submit either the $5.00 filing fee or the ifp application (enclosed) within 30 days of this Order's entry date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 8/9/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narvell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?