Parks et al v. Central Arkansas Veterans Healthcare System of Little Rock et al

Plaintiff: Billy Parks, Jr and Cassie Parks
Defendant: Central Arkansas Veterans Healthcare System of Little Rock and John Does
Case Number: 5:2010cv00240
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Shaina Parks against USA for $8,000.00 on the Estate's survival claim and for $5,443.51 in costs. The total due, $13,443.51, shall accrue interest at 0.12% per annum from today until paid in full 96 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/30/11. (kpr)
December 9, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER awarding plaintiff's estate $8,000.00 on its survival claim, for plaintiff's pain and suffering from September 6-8, 2008. The Court looks forward to receiving either the parties' stipulation or a motion by December 19, 2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/9/11. (kpr)
October 31, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER taking under advisement 25 Motion to Exclude; granting 56 Motion in Limine, as agreed; and denying 58 Motion in Limine without prejudice. Plaintiffs' oral motions to dismiss without prejudice all of the John Doe defts, as well as B illy Parks, Jr. and Cassie Parks, as named pltfs, are granted. In addition, the individual claims of Shaina Parks are dismissed without prejudice, too. The Clerk is directed to correct the docket so that only Shaina Parks, as special administrator of the estate of Billy Parks, Sr., and the United States remain as parties. The Court further finds that compelling circumstances exist to warrant taking Dr. Quintiliani's additional testimony by contemporaneous transmission from Connecticut, and looks forward to an update from the parties on this matter. To accommodate the technology needed, trial will be held in Courtroom 2A beginning at 8:30 a.m. on 7 November 2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/31/11. (kpr)
October 11, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will hold a pre-trial hearing on October 21, 2011 at 4:00 p.m. in Little Rock. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/11/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks et al v. Central Arkansas Veterans Healthcare System of Little Rock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Parks, Jr
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie Parks
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Arkansas Veterans Healthcare System of Little Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?