Oakes v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Phillip J Oakes
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Wendy Kelly, Micheal. Pheiffer and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00278
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 78 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this case with prejudice with respect to pltf's claims against the ADC, and without prejudice in all other respects; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/26/11. (vjt)
February 1, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 29 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety and dismissing deft Michael Pheiffer without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/1/11. (bkp)
November 19, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 25 Motion to Amend Complaint to add defts George Wilson and Judy Savoy; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaints 2 25 , and this Order on defts Wilson and Savoy without prepayment of fees and costs; pltf is directed to respond to defts' 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment, no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/19/10. (vjt)
October 25, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing the Arkanas Department of Corrections with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/25/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakes v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip J Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal. Pheiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?