Robinson v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Dominic Robinson
Defendant: Roderick Johnson, Antwon Emsweller, C Sherrill, Malcolm Crompton, Brian Perkins, Curtis Meinzer, J Williams, Jimmy Banks, Kristie Bailey, Tonda Spencer, Felicia Piggee, Gilliam, Bobby Jones, Martha Hewing, Gordon and Michelle Ruccer
Case Number: 5:2010cv00322
Filed: November 5, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 91 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Robinson must still pay the full statutory appellate filing fee. An initial partial filing fee will not be assessed, but Robinson's present custodian and all future custodians sha ll collect monthly payments and forward the amounts to the Clerk of the Court until the $505.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Varner Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/17/2014. (jak)
February 18, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing Robinson's complaint with prejudice. All claims against all defendnats have been adjudicated. The Court certifies that, with one exception, an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the related Orders would not be taken in good faith. An in forma pauperis appeal on the excessive-force claim would be in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/18/2014. (jak)
December 13, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court directs the defendants to provide an explanation by 12/18/2013 as to why 72 the video footage of the incident was filed under seal. Robinson has not seen the video footage of the incident. Defendants must give Robinson the opportunity to watch the footage of the incident at least twice, and make notes by 12/31/2013. Robinson may supplement his objection by 01/15/2014. 79 77] Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/13/2013. (rhm)
August 15, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the recommendation on Robinson's conditions-of-confinement claim and overruling the objection 63 . The Court declines to accept the recommendation about the excessive force claim. The 49 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted i n part and held in abeyance in part. Robinson's conditions-of-confinement claim is dismissed with prejudice. A copy of the video on a DVD is due by 8/23/2013. The matter is returned to Judge Volpe for another recommendation based on a more-complete record. The Court directs the Clerk to correct the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/15/2013. (dmn)
May 1, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 54 Order. Order was mistakenly entered in this case instead of Mr. Robinson's other case, 5:10-cv-324-DPM-JTR. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/1/13. (kpr)
May 18, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing Robinson's claims for monetary damages against any deft. The Court also dismisses Robinson's retaliation claim. Robinson's claims against defts Jimmy Banks, Curtis Meinzer, Malcolm Crompton, J. Williams, Gilliam, Bobby Jones, Martha Hewing, and Gordon are dismissed for plaintiff's failure to state claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/18/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Dominic Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antwon Emsweller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Sherrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Crompton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristie Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonda Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Piggee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Hewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Ruccer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?