Wright v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Marcus Lavon Wright
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00344
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the 28 Order entered in this case on this date, the Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/18/2012. (dmn)
March 15, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail; and directing the Respondent to file a responsive pleading within 21 days after service of the petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/15/11. (kpr)
December 3, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marcus Lavon Wright directing the plaintiff to submit a complete ifp application with the prisoner trust fund calculation sheet prepared and signed by an authorized officer at the incarcerating facility, or to submit the $5.00 filing fee in full; and directing the Clerk to forward to plaintiff an ifp application form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/3/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Lavon Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?