Grant v. Correctional Medical Services Inc

Plaintiff: Abraham Grant, Sr
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv00368
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 54 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/9/11. (kpr)
August 12, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 32 Partial Proposed Findings and Recommendations; and, denying 29 Grant's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/12/2011. (dmn)
June 20, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge H. David Young's partial Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; and denying 19 Grant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/20/11. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Correctional Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Grant, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?