Proctor v. Suphan et al

Plaintiff: Terry Proctor
Defendant: Neema Suphan, Alva Green, Wendy Kelley, Vera Miller, Tim Mullins, N Ifediora and Correctional Medical Services
Case Number: 5:2010cv00376
Filed: December 28, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2012 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 184 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge, granting 158 , 165 and 167 Motions for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs constitutional claims against Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs state law medical malpractice claims against Defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/26/2012. (mcz)
July 1, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 Motion to Compel; granting 105 Motion to Dismiss Motion for Copies 94 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/1/11. (kpr)
June 7, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 53 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 67 Motion to Compel; granting 72 Motion for Copies; finding as moot 74 Motion for Service; denying 26 Motion to Vacate. The Clerk is directed to forward to pltf a copy of document number 58 and to note plaintiff's jury demand on the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/7/11. (kpr)
May 31, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 59 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 6 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, which this Court construes as a Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/31/11. (vjt)
April 19, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Neema Suphan, Tim Mullins, Vera Miller, and N. Ifediora, and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and Complaint on defts without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/19/11. (kpr)
March 7, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 14 Plaintiff's Objections, which the Court construes as a Motion for Extension of Time, is GRANTED; pltf is directed to submit an ifp application (enclosed), in accordance with the Court's Order 11 , within 15 days of the date of this Order; failure to comply may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/7/11. (vjt)
February 14, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file an application to proceed ifp within 15 days of the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to send to plaintiff an ifp application; and directing the Clerk to re-docket the 9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Terry Proctor as a Proposed Order in support of plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/14/11. (bkp)
January 7, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit the $350 statutory filing fee or an application to proceed ifp within 30 days of the entry of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to plaintiff an ifp application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/7/11. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Suphan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neema Suphan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alva Green
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Ifediora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?