Butler v. May et al

Plaintiff: Michael Butler
Defendant: Johnny Giddens, Larry May, Phillip Gordon, Mertha Jasper, Ray Butler, James Banks and Curtis Meinzer
Case Number: 5:2011cv00012
Filed: January 20, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects 97 Report and Recommendations; granting defendants' oral motion to dismiss, and dismissing plaintiff's 1 complaint without prejudice. The Court certifies that an informa pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/1/2013. (dmn)
July 25, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to submit the outstanding balance of his filing fee, or to complete and sign the IFP application (enclosed), and file it, no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/25/12. (vjt)
July 17, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to submit the $345.83 outstanding balance of his $350 filing fee, or to complete and sign the IFP application (enclosed), and file it, no later than 30 days after the entry date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/17/12. (vjt)
November 7, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 63 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/7/11. (vjt)
October 13, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 53 Motion for Reconsideration; granting pltf's 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to 63 Partial Report and Recommendations; Objections to R&R due 10/28/11. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/13/11. (vjt)
June 7, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 37 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 12 Motion for TRO or Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/7/11. (vjt)
March 9, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf is allowed to proceed on his excessive force and conditions of confinement claims against defts May, Giddens, Gordon, Jasper, Butler, Mienzer, and Banks; all of pltf's other claims against all other defts are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Ravonna Walker, Bobby Washington, Grant Harris and Ray Hobbs terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/9/11. (vjt)
February 14, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the name of deft Hewing to deft Jasper; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, Amended Complaint 7 , and this Order on defts May, Giddens, Gordon, Jasper, Butler, Mienzer, and Banks without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/14/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Giddens
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Gordon
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mertha Jasper
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Butler
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?