Poe v. Howell et al

Plaintiff: Corey Ray Poe
Defendant: J Savoy, Barnes, Kay Howell and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2011cv00019
Filed: February 1, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Corey Poe's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2012. (dmn)
January 17, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a response, within 10 days of the date of this Order, to defts' Motions for Summary 46 49 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/17/12. (vjt)
June 22, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 37 Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney's Proposed Findings and Recommendations; and denying Poe's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/22/11. (hph)
May 5, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file responses to 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Corey Ray Poe within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/5/11. (kpr)
March 14, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons and the amended complaint on defts Kay Howell and Wendy Kelley in care of the ADC Compliance Division and on defts J. Savoy and Dr. Barnes in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, without prepayment of fees therefor; and further ordering defts to file a response to pltf's motion for temporary restraining order, which this Court construes as a motion for preliminary injunctive relief, within 15 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/14/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poe v. Howell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Savoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Howell
Represented By: Amanda Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Amanda Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Ray Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?