Bailey v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Bailey
Defendant: Larry D May, James Banks, James Gibson, Curtis Meinzer, Revonna Walker and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2011cv00031
Filed: February 8, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $1,774.21 and distribute it to Williams & Anderson, PLC. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Library Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/15/2015. (jak)
January 7, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The 2 complaint and all claims in this action against defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice.The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/7/2015. (ks)
August 19, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Joint MOTION to Continue. The Jury trial of this matter previously set for September 15, 2014, in Little Rock, Arkansas, is removed from the Court's docket. A new bench trial date will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/19/2014. (jak)
July 25, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 51 Partial Report and Recommendations, defts' 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/25/12. (vjt)
June 26, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf 14 days from the entry of this Order to file a response to the ADC defts' 54 Objections to Report and Recommendations; any reply will be due within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/26/12. (vjt)
May 21, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 52 MOTION to Extend Time to File Objections; Objections to R&R due 6/1/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/21/12. (vjt)
March 23, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 19 motion to dismiss John Doe Defendant; pltf's claims against Doe defendant are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/23/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry D May
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revonna Walker
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Bailey
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?