Cummins v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Acie Cummins
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Curtis Meinzer, Roderizk E Johnson, James Plummer, Joycelin Davis and Lorene Washington
Case Number: 5:2011cv00048
Filed: March 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 58 Memorandum and Order dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/23/12. (kpr)
April 10, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 52 Response to witness list. The ADC is directed to ensure the attendance of CO-1 Beverly Miller and Plaintiff Acie Cummins, together with his medical and institutional files, at the April 16, 2012 hearing. The Clerk is directed to forwa rd a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 6814 Princeton Pike, Pine Bluff, AR 71602. Plaintiff's request to have Nurse Amanda Watt testify is disallowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/10/12. (kpr)
March 28, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to supplement his 49 Witness List within seven days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/28/12. (kpr)
June 2, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 7 26 Partial Reports and Recommendations are now to be treated as an Opinion of t he Court; dismissing defts Hobbs and Meinzer for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; and denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/2/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummins v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acie Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderizk E Johnson
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Plummer
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joycelin Davis
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorene Washington
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?