Thornton v. Evans et al

Plaintiff: Billy Thornton, Jr
Defendant: Norman L Hodges, Davis, Harris, Marvin Evans, Jr, William Straughn, Steve Outlaw, N Kelly, York, Lyons, A Tyler and Powell
Case Number: 5:2011cv00066
Filed: March 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 44 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/15/11. (vjt)
September 1, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 41 Order on Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/1/11. (vjt)
June 9, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 33 MOTION to Stay Discovery, pending resolution of the Summary Judgment Motion; pltf is directed to respond to defts' 30 Motion for Summary Judgment within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/9/11. (vjt)
May 31, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts Lyons, Tyler, and Hodges are DISMISSED from this action, for failure to state a claim; all pltf's claims, except the denial of access to the courts claim, are DISMISSED, for failure to state a claim. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/31/11. (vjt)
May 26, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; and determining that the 15 Motion for Discovery should be re-docketed as a Request for Discovery from Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/26/11. (kpr)
May 10, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 4 Order granting motion to proceed ifp. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for defts Evans, Straughn, Outlaw, Kelly, York, Powell, Harris and Davis, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve these defts with summons and a copy of the Am ended Complaint in care of the Arkansas Board of Correction and Community Punishment Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/10/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman L Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Thornton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?