Smith v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Ricky Smith
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2011cv00072
Filed: March 24, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 48 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order dismissing the petition for writ of habeas corpus with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/22/12. (kpr)
June 21, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in all respects 45 Partial Recommended Disposition, and denying 40 Mr. Smith's Motion to Amend his Peitition. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/21/2012. (dmn)
July 26, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Petitoner's Motion to Stay; directing the Clerk of Court to administratively terminate the case; and directing the Petitioner to file a motion to reopen the case within 45 days of his 8/23/11 parole hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/26/11. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Kent G. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?