Smith v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Theodis Smith
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2011cv00079
Filed: April 4, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/12/2012. Nunc Pro Tunc: 6/8/2012.(dmn)
June 8, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 21 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/8/12. (kpr)
October 28, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing petitioner of his opportunity to reply within 30 days of this Order's entry-date to any of Respondent's arguments raised in the 10 Response to Habeas Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/28/11. (kpr)
July 11, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Seal Exhibit 4 to Respondent's response to the petition for writ of habeas corpus under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/11/11. (kpr)
May 16, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail. The respondent shall file his answer within 20 days after service of the petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/16/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?