Anderson v. Hubbard et al

Plaintiff: Theodore A Anderson
Defendant: Connie Hubbard, Lytle, Barnes, Larry Norris, Donna Gordon, Gina Synder, Correctional Medical Services and Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 5:2011cv00100
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 114 Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/12/2012. (dmn)
June 1, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file a response and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts to 89 Defendant's Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Connie Hubbard within 30 days. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properl y comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts set forth in Defendant's summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/01/2012. (kcs)
February 22, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 67 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 59 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; defts Snyder, Barnes and Gordon are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pltf may proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against deft Hubbard. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/22/12. (vjt)
December 20, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff shall file, within thirty days of the entry of this Order, a Response to docket entries # 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Genia Snyder, Donna Gordon, Connie Hubbard, Shirley Barnes, # 60 Brief in Support filed by Genia Snyd er, Donna Gordon, Connie Hubbard, Shirley Barnes,and # 61 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1), Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) filed by Genia Snyder, Donna Gordon, Connie Hubbard, Shirley Barnes, following the instructions set forth in this Or der. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts set forth in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/20/2011. (kcs)
December 2, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 53 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft Lytle's Motion to Dismiss 40 is GRANTED, and he is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; pltf's request to file an amended complaint 52 is DENIED; pltf's motion for extension of time to file objections 55 is moot. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/2/11. (vjt)
September 23, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 44 Partial Report and Recommendations; GRANTING 20 Motion for Summary Judgment by Larry Norris; Norris is Dismissed With Prejudice; The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/23/11. (dac)
June 27, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the June 24, 2011 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations 13 is MODIFIED ONLY to the extent that the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint, and June 24, 2011 Order on separate Defendant Larry Norris through the ADC Compliance Division, without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/27/11. (vjt)
June 24, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing party ADC with prejudice and party CMS without prejudice; and certifying that an ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for defts Hub bard, Lytle, Barnes, Norris, Gordon, and Snyder, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint and this Order on them through the Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, without prepayment of fees. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/24/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Hubbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lytle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Synder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?