Alexander/Ryahim v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Charles E Alexander/Ryahim, Jr
Defendant: King, Campbell, Brownlee, Randall Manus, Straughn, Ray Hobbs and Crystal Woods
Case Number: 5:2011cv00133
Filed: May 24, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 196 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2012. (mcz)
March 1, 2012 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 145 Partial Report and Recommendations; denying 109 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 84 Motion for TRO filed by Charles E Alexander/Ryahim, Jr. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/1/12. (kpr)
January 27, 2012 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 89 Partial Report and Recommendations; denying 77 Motion for Order to Show Cause; and, denying 74 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/27/2012. (dmn)
October 6, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 28 denying 23 Motion for Declaratory Judgment, Motion for Relief Jr, and 22 Motion to Compel filed by Charles E Alexander/Ryahim, Jr. The Clerk is directed to correct the docket to reflect that Brownlee is still a party to this action, as the Court did not dismiss plaintiff's retaliation claim against deft Brownlee. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/6/11. (kpr)
July 28, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claim against defendant Brownlee with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander/Ryahim v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Manus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Alexander/Ryahim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?