Conway v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Byron L Conway
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs and Correctional Medical Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv00142
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of the defendants and against plaintiff re 44 Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/29/12. (kpr)
June 28, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/28/12. (kpr)
April 16, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff is directed to file within 30 days a Response to 30 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wendy Kelley. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the f acts set forth in Defendant's summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(a); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/16/2012. (kcs)
April 10, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion to Compel; granting 27 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant is directed to file any dispositive motions on or before 04/13/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/10/2012. (kcs)
October 21, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 and denying the Motion 11 to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Wendy Kelley. Deft shall file an Answer within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/21/11. (kpr)
August 23, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff shall file, within thirty days of the entry of this Order, a Response to docket entry # 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Wendy Kelley. Plaintiff is advised that if he fails to timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/23/2011. (kcs)
July 26, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing, without prejudice, plaintiff's constitutional and pendent state law claims against defts CMS, Norris, and Hobbs. Pltf's request for monetary damages against deft Kelley, in her official capacity only, is dismissed, with prejudice. Plaintiff shall proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against deft Kelley in her official capacity for injunctive and declaratory relief, and in her individual capacity for monet ary damages. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for deft Kelley and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, and this Order on her through the ADC Compliance Office without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/26/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conway v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron L Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?