Vann v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Lamont Clayton Vann
Defendant: Russell McCrimmon, A Johnson, Grant Harris, James Banks, Curtis Meinzer, Tonya Spencer, B Tranthan and Emsweller
Case Number: 5:2011cv00146
Filed: June 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 193 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT entered in favor of Defendants Curtis Meinzer, Tonda Spencer, and Arthur Johnson and against Lamont Clayton Vann. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/13/2013. (dmn)
May 2, 2013 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 182 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 183 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/2/13. (kpr)
August 22, 2012 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 154 Partial Report and Recommendations; DENYING 117 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; 120 146 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED in part, with respect to Plaintiff's clai ms regarding general cleanliness of cells and lack of cleaning supplies; Defendant Trantham is DISMISSED as a party to this action; 120 146 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment are DENIED with respect to Plaintiff's claim of being placed in a cell with dried blood and feces on walls and ceiling for more than two months; and, GRANTING Plaintiff's oral motion to voluntarily dismiss Defendant Emsweller. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/22/2012. (dmn)
May 31, 2012 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety 135 Partial Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion for Summary Judgment; and, holding in abeyance ruling on the remaining issues raised by both parties in their 117 and 120 Motions for Summary Judgment pending a hearing to more fully develop the facts and issues. The Court will issue a seperate order setting the hearing. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/31/2012. (dmn)
September 30, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 56 and denying plaintiff's motion for Order, which this Court construes as a motion for preliminary injunction 40 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/30/11. (kpr)
September 9, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 46 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying the 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lamont Clayton Vann. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/9/11. (kpr)
July 5, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing deft Hobbs from plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/5/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vann v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell McCrimmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Tranthan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emsweller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Clayton Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?