Avery et al v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Chadarious Avery and Karen Walls
Defendant: Earnest E Brown, Jr, Roderick Shelby, Gerald Robinson and Jose Rivera
Case Number: 5:2011cv00174
Filed: July 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion to Dismiss Party. Claims against Sheriff Robinson, in his individual and official capacity, are dismissed with prejudice. Claims against Mr. Shelby, in his official capacity only, are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/10/13. (kpr)
December 21, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plainiff Karen Walls, as next friend of Chaderious Avery, a minor, against defendant Roderick Shelby in the amount of $6,002.00. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/21/2012. (dmn)
December 17, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion in Limine; granting 56 Motion in Limine; granting 57 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/17/12. (kpr)
December 12, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Pretrial Conference set for Thursday, December 13, 2012, at 2:30 p.m. The Court will provide all counsel with call-in information by email. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/12/12. (kpr)
November 9, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss Party Jose Rivera with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/9/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery et al v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadarious Avery
Represented By: John Jason Boyeskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Walls
Represented By: John Jason Boyeskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnest E Brown, Jr
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Shelby
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Gene E. McKissic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Robinson
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?