Conway v. Corizon Inc et al

Plaintiff: Byron L Conway
Defendant: Corizon Inc, Dottie Yarbrough and Melvin Nance
Case Number: 5:2011cv00234
Filed: September 8, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 30 Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/6/2012. (dmn)
December 15, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft Yarbrough is DISMISSED from pltf's amended complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; Dottie Yarbrough terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/15/11. (vjt)
November 22, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Corizon, Inc., Nance and Lebel. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on these defts in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/22/11. (kpr)
October 4, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 MOTION to Dismiss deft Maples filed by Byron L Conway; John Maples, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/4/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conway v. Corizon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dottie Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Nance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron L Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?