Polite v. Child Development Inc

Plaintiff: Teresa Polite
Defendant: Child Development Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv00252
Filed: September 27, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Desha
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the reasons stated in the Court's previous Orders, pltf's 68 Motion is denied; because pltf has failed to pay costs as ordered, the complaint is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/27/12. (vjt)
July 24, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part deft's 53 Motion for Sanctions and Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute; pltf must reimburse deft $2,289.17 within 21 days from the entry date of this Order; pltf's 57 Motion for Sanctions and for Disciplinary Actions is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/24/12. (vjt)
May 22, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 41 MOTION to Postpone is denied; deft's 42 MOTION to Compel is granted; Discovery deadline is extended until 6/15/12, for the limited purpose of taking pltf's deposition; Motions due by 7/16/2012. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/22/12. (vjt)
April 5, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Pursuant to Stipulation and Agreement re confidential information. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/5/12. (vjt)
March 23, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Teresa Polite; defts shall submit to the Court a copy of the Protective Order attached to its response as directed; 31 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Teresa Polite is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polite v. Child Development Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Polite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Development Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?