Yielding v. Correctional Medical Services et al

Plaintiff: Shawn Yielding
Defendant: Austin, William Albert Warren, Moskovich, Wendy Kelly, Esau and Anderson
Case Number: 5:2011cv00261
Filed: October 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 77 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft Kelley's Motion for Summary Judgment 73 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/8/13. (vjt)
August 20, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 69 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, defts' 62 Motion to Deem Admitted is DENIED as moot; defts' 59 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; pltf's claims against defts Moskovich and Esaw are DISMISSED without prejudice, and the claims against defts Anderson, Austin, and Warren are DISMISSED with prejudice; pltf's claims against deft Wendy Kelly remain. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/20/12. (vjt)
March 20, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 50 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 42 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/20/12. (vjt)
January 11, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to provide a present address on Arlene Moskovich within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/11/12. (kpr)
October 21, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, CMS is DISMISSED from this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; pltf's motion to amend 7 is DENIED; Correctional Medical Services terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/21/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yielding v. Correctional Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Albert Warren
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Represented By: James O. Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esau
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Yielding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?