Dickerson v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Arthur Dickerson
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2011cv00273
Filed: October 19, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 24 Order dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/24/12. (kpr)
May 24, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, directing the Petitioner to file, on or before 6/11/2012, a Reply addressing the arguments for dismissal raised in 12 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Ray Hobbs. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/24/2012. (kcs)
January 23, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Court directs the Petitioner to file, or or before 02/23/2012, a Reply addressing the arguments for dismissal raised in 12 Response to Habeas Petition filed by Ray Hobbs. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/23/2012. (kcs)
December 27, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Ray Hobbs answer due 1/20/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/27/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?