Bland v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Glenn Ricky Bland
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2011cv00286
Filed: November 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 15 Motion for Reconsideration; the motion for certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/31/12. (vjt)
July 13, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 13 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/13/12. (vjt)
June 21, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Objections to R&R due 7/6/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/21/12. (vjt)
November 8, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail. The Respondent will file his response within 21 days after service of this petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/8/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bland v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Ricky Bland
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Rebecca Bailey Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?