Cantrell v. Hudson et al

Plaintiff: Jimmy Shane Cantrell
Defendant: L Skinner, Johnnie E Hudson, Jonathan C Smart, Ray Hobbs, Raymond Naylor, Danny Burl, James Gibson and Does
Case Number: 5:2011cv00289
Filed: November 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 64 Order entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is hereby DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/25/2012. (dmn)
August 21, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion for TRO; granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by L Skinner, Johnnie E Hudson, Jonathan C Smart ; denying [59 ] Motion for TRO; denying 59 Motion for Copies. The Court will grant plaintiff an additional 30 days to file his objections to the Recommended Disposition, up to and including September 18, 2012. The Clerk is directed to send plaintiff an updated docket sheet. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/21/12. (kpr)
July 10, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/10/12. (kpr)
June 20, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 37 Partial Report and Recommendations in all respects, and denying 36 Mr. Cantrell's Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/20/2012. (dmn)
March 6, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to re-issue a summons for deft Johnnie E. Hudson at the address provided under seal. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and amended complaint with any attachments and the summons on Mr. Hudson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/6/12. (kpr)
February 9, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's claims against defts Hobbs, Naylor, Burl, Gibson, and the Doe defts without prejudice. The pltf's claims against defts Hudson, Smart, and Skinner are also dismissed without prejudice, as to the violation of his fifth and fourteenth amendment rights. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/9/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Hudson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie E Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan C Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Shane Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?