Murphy v. Robinson et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Murphy
Defendant: Smith, G Robinson, Bowlin, Tyler, White and Adem
Case Number: 5:2011cv00326
Filed: December 21, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 90 Plaintiff's Application for Disbursement of Library Funds; directing the Clerk of the Court to disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $508.58 and distribute it to Robert Young; and directing a copy of this Order and the Application be placed in the Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/8/2014. (srw)
September 3, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 86 Jury Verdict, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant Darinda Smith. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/3/2014. (srw)
August 12, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 57 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; granting 53 defendant Smith's motion for summary judgment as to plaintiff Lisa Murphy's official capacity claims against Smith, and dismissing these claims; and denying the motion in all other respects. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/12/2013. (kdr)
May 4, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition. Defendants White, Bowlin, G. Robinson, Tyler, and Adem are dismissed from this action for plaintiff Lisa Murphy's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted . Murphy's claim that defendant Smith laughed at her is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Murphy's remaining claims against Smith are allowed to proceed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/4/12. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?