Pryor-Kendrick v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Theresa C W Pryor-Kendrick
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00006
Filed: January 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to return the attached papers and any papers submitted by plaintiff until her appeal is resolved. This case is done for the time being in this Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/11/13. (Attachments: miscellaneous documents)(kpr)
January 24, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re papers submitted to the Court by Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to return the papers to plaintiff with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/24/13. (Attachments: # 1 Document Misc. filings by plaintiff)(kpr)
September 11, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Ray Hobbs against Theresa C W Pryor-Kendrick re 35 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing the petition for writ of habeas corpus with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/11/12. (kpr)
July 6, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER which declines the 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Court refers the motion to amend, the motion for reconsideration and the motion for sentence reduction to Judge Kearney ; granting 21 MOTION for Copies and directing the Clerk to provide pltf with the four days of journal entries for use as evidence in another lawsuit. Those entries are attached to this Order. Her motion for copies is otherwise denied for now. The Clerk is directed to return plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents since this is a Habeas case. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One, # 2 Exhibit Two, # 3 Exhibit Three, # 4 Exhibit Four, # 5 Exhibit Five). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/6/12.(kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pryor-Kendrick v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa C W Pryor-Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Eileen Woods Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?