Hill v. Walker

Plaintiff: Yulanda Hill
Defendant: Carolyn Walker
Case Number: 5:2012cv00016
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Carolyn Walker against Yulanda Hill re 47 Order dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/18/13. (kpr)
October 9, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Walker's 20 Partial Motion to Dismiss. Hill's FLSA, FMLA and due process claims against Walker are dismissed in their entirety, without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/9/2012. (mcz)
April 26, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/26/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yulanda Hill
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Walker
Represented By: Lori Freno-Engman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?