Johnson v. Hughes et al

Plaintiff: Carlest Matthews Johnson
Defendant: Crystal Sims, Junita Horn, Joseph Hughes, Marybeth Floyd and Corizon Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv00042
Filed: January 30, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 92 Order entered this day, Johnson's claims against defendants Marybeth Floyd and Jennifer Horn are dismissed with prejudice. Johnson's claims against defendants Joseph Hughes, Corizon, Inc., and Crystal Sims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/5/2012. (dmn)
June 4, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 61 the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; and denying 46 plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/4/12. (hph)
April 30, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adotping 35 the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; and denying Corizon, Inc.'s motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/30/12. (hph)
February 29, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to provide, no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order, the correct name of the deft identified as Junita Horn. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/29/12. (vjt)
February 28, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to provide, no later than 20 days after the entry of this Order, Horn's last known address, to be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/28/12. (vjt)
February 21, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Joseph Hughes. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/21/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Sims
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junita Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hughes
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marybeth Floyd
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Inc
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlest Matthews Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?