Hobbs v. King et al

Plaintiff: Harold Hobbs
Defendant: V King, Crook and W Strong
Case Number: 5:2012cv00064
Filed: February 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2015 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 115 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION as this Court's findings in all respects. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 04/07/2015. (rhm)
April 5, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects 47 Partial Report and Recommendations. Defendants' Motion for Judgment 43 is granted to the extent that Plaintiff's claims against them in their official capacity are dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/5/2013. (dmn)
July 30, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 26 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/30/12. (vjt)
March 6, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaint 2 , and this Order on deft King (ADDRESS UNDER SEAL) without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/6/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?